Frost et al v. Valdez-Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: |
Deangela Frost and John Sotofalcon |
Defendant: |
Luis Valdez-Gonzalez and TBM Carriers |
Case Number: |
1:2018cv00088 |
Filed: |
April 20, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Cape Girardeau Office |
County: |
Pemiscot |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephen N. Limbaugh |
Nature of Suit: |
Motor Vehicle |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 29, 2021 |
Filing
64
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 61 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Deangela Frost: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to file first amended complaint [#61] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 04/29/2021. (CMH)
|
January 14, 2021 |
Filing
48
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 44 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs ;attorney/firm John L. Wilbers filed by Plaintiff John Sotofalcon, Plaintiff Deangela Frost, 42 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discover y filed by Plaintiff John Sotofalcon, Plaintiff Deangela Frost, 43 Fourth MOTION for Extension of: Case Management Order filed by Plaintiff John Sotofalcon, Plaintiff Deangela Frost; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs� 39; counsel's motion to withdraw [#44] is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' counsel shall advise both plaintiffs regarding the requirements set out by this Memorandum and Order and shall provide the Court with plaintiffs conta ct information so that the plaintiffs will receive further communications from the Court; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs shall have 30 days in which to have new counsel file entries of appearance and that the parties shall have 14 days there after in which to file a joint proposed Amended Case Management Order; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if either plaintiff does not have a new attorney file an appearance within 30 days of this Memorandum and Order, then such a plaintiff shall file a m emorandum with the Court stating his or her intention to continue prosecuting his or her claims; IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the motions for extension [#42, #43] are GRANTED in part, and all current deadlines are vacated. (Response to Court due by 2/16/2021.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 01/14/2021. (CMH)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?