Tatro v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Terri L. Tatro
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2018cv00204
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service showing service on defendant by certified mail to Office of Regional Counsel on 9/11/18. (CSG)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U. S. Marshal Service showing service on defendant by certified mail to U.S. Attorney General on 9/11/18. (CSG)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 9/7/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (CSG)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Terri L. Tatro. (CSG)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
August 21, 2018 Summonses Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summonses were hand delivered to U.S. Marshal Service, Cape Girardeau, Missouri. (CSG)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER : This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/10/2018. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 8/20/18. (CSG)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 8/20/18. (CSG)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 17, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. (CSG)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 1:18-cv-204 by Plaintiff Terri L. Tatro. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Koch, Frank)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT 1:18-cv-204 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Terri L. Tatro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Koch, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tatro v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri L. Tatro
Represented By: Frank T. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?