Trice v. Rodgers et al
Plaintiff: Richard Matthew Trice
Defendant: Eli Rodgers and Tom Wilkinson
Case Number: 1:2018cv00207
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - This matter is before the Court upon its own motion. Mail to plaintiff from the Court was returned without a forwarding address on September 4, 2018. As a result, the Court shall dismiss this action without prejudice pursuant to Local Rule 2.06(B). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/5/2018. (JMC)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Richard Trice. Returned document(s): Complaint Letter Created. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (JMC)
August 22, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Aug 22 15:02:59 CDT 2018 (admin,)
August 22, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JMC)
August 22, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Henry E. Autrey. (JMC)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Richard Matthew Trice. (JMC)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Richard Matthew Trice. (JMC)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Richard Matthew Trice. (JMC)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 DCM COMPLAINT against defendant Eli Rodgers, Tom Wilkinson jury Demand,, filed by Richard Matthew Trice. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Envelope, #3 Criminal Cover Sheet)(JMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trice v. Rodgers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Matthew Trice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?