Carroll v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: John Carroll
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2018cv00210
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 9/11/2018 through US Attorney General (MRS)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nancy Berryhill served through Social Security Administration on 9/7/18 (MRS)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 9/7/2018 through US Attorney, answer due 11/6/2018. (MRS)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
August 23, 2018 Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS - Cape. (MRS)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4, Administrative..Pursuant to Rule 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). (see order for further briefing ddls). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/23/18. (MRS)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/23/18. (MRS)
August 23, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. (MRS)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff John Carroll. (Overton, Kathleen)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by John Carroll. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons US Atty, #4 Summons Office of Regional Counsel, #5 Summons Atty General)(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Carroll
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?