Turner v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: billy joe turner
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2018cv00215
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 10 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Billy Joe Turner. (CSG)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service showing service on defendant by certified mail to Office of Regional Counsel on 9/7/18. (CSG) Modified on 9/27/2018 (CSG).
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service showing service on defendant by certified mail to U.S. Attorney General on 9/13/18. (CSG)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 9/7/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (CSG)
September 25, 2018 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Billy Joe Turner to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/2/2018. (CSG)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/19/2018. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 8/29/18. (CSG)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] isGRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 8/29/18. (CSG)
August 29, 2018 Summonses Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summonses were hand delivered to U.S. Marshal Service, Cape Girardeau, Missouri. (CSG)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff billy joe turner. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Financial Statement)(Thornton, Fred)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by billy joe turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons for Defendant, Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Commission, #4 Summons Summons for the United States Attorney General, #5 Summons Summons for Assistand United States Attorney General)(Thornton, Fred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: billy joe turner
Represented By: Fred H. Thornton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?