Country Mutual Insurance Co. Inc. v. Clements et al
Plaintiff: Country Mutual Insurance Co. Inc.
Defendant: Jaime Adams, Debra Clements and Krista Adams
Case Number: 1:2018cv00273
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Country Mutual Insurance Co. Inc.. (de Luca, Daniel)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Fri Dec 21 15:28:14 CST 2018 (Gould, Cathy)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel J. de Luca. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6935028) by Plaintiff Country Mutual Insurance Co. Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certs of Good Standing)(de Luca, Daniel) filed by Country Mutual Insurance Co. Inc.; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/20/18. (CSG)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel J. de Luca. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6935028) by Plaintiff Country Mutual Insurance Co. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certs of Good Standing)(de Luca, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Jaime Adams, Krista Adams, Debra Clements. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Mr. Radice)(CSG)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Country Mutual Insurance Co. Inc.. Krista Adams served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Radice, Robert)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Country Mutual Insurance Co. Inc.. Jaime Adams served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Radice, Robert)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Country Mutual Insurance Co. Inc.. Debra Clements served on 11/27/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Radice, Robert)
November 8, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Robert Radice. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MRS)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Country Mutual Insurance Co. Inc. Process Server: Sheriff of Cape Girardeau (Radice, Robert)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6866070, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Country Mutual Insurance Co. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1 - Residential Lease, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #4 Summons Summons - Def Clements, #5 Summons Summons - Def J Adams, #6 Summons Summons - Def K Adams)(Radice, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Country Mutual Insurance Co. Inc. v. Clements et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krista Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Country Mutual Insurance Co. Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Radice
Represented By: Daniel J. de Luca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?