Couch v. Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center et al

Plaintiff: Claudette Couch
Defendant: CHSPSC, LLC and Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2018cv00277
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Claudette Couch. Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. (Rozynski, Andrew)
January 7, 2019 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Claudette Couch. CHSPSC, LLC served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. (Rozynski, Andrew)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Defendants CHSPSC, LLC, Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center. (Hardy, Ryan) filed by CHSPSC, LLC, Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center ; ORDERED GRANTED( Response to Court due by 1/11/2019.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/11/2018. (JMC)
December 10, 2018 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Francis X. Neuner, Jr for Defendants CHSPSC, LLC, Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center. (Neuner, Francis)
December 10, 2018 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants CHSPSC, LLC, Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center.. (Hardy, Ryan)
December 10, 2018 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Defendants CHSPSC, LLC, Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center. (Hardy, Ryan)
December 10, 2018 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan C. Hardy for Defendants CHSPSC, LLC, Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center. (Hardy, Ryan)
November 14, 2018 Summonses Issued as to defendants CHSPSC, LLC, Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center. The summonses were emailed to Andrew Rozynski. (JMC)
November 13, 2018 4 NOTICE Proposed Summons - Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center and CHSPSC, LLC: by Plaintiff Claudette Couch re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons - Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center)(Rozynski, Andrew)
November 13, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (JMC)
November 13, 2018 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Claudette Couch Process Server: Guaranteed Subpoena Service (JMC)
November 13, 2018 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Claudette Couch Process Server: Guaranteed Subpoena Service (JMC)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against defendant CHSPSC, LLC, Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center with receipt number 0865-6869208, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Claudette Couch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Intent to Use Process Server - CHSPSC, LLC, #4 Intent to Use Process Server - Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center)(Rozynski, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Couch v. Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudette Couch
Represented By: Andrew Rozynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHSPSC, LLC
Represented By: Ryan C. Hardy
Represented By: Francis X. Neuner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poplar Bluff Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Ryan C. Hardy
Represented By: Francis X. Neuner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?