ServisFirst Bank v. Young et al
Plaintiff: ServisFirst Bank
Defendant: Young's WestSide Motors LLC, Young's General Contracting, Inc., Dennis J Young and Young's General Contractors LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00002
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2, Standard Joint Scheduling Plan due by 4/3/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 4/10/2019 10:00 AM by Telephone before District Judge John A. Ross.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/6/19. (MRS)
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dennis J Young, Young's General Contracting, Inc., Young's General Contractors LLC, Young's WestSide Motors LLC.(Payne, J.)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni termed. Case reassigned to District Judge John A. Ross for all further proceedings (MRS)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by ServisFirst Bank. Young's WestSide Motors LLC served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (McCurdy, Megan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by ServisFirst Bank. Young's General Contracting, Inc. served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (McCurdy, Megan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by ServisFirst Bank. Young's General Contractors LLC served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (McCurdy, Megan)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by ServisFirst Bank. Dennis J Young served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (McCurdy, Megan)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #4 for Plaintiff Servisfirst Bank filed by Counsel Douglas J. Centeno of Birmingham, Alabama. Counsel Centeno has met the requirements for admission pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on January 11, 2019. (ACL)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Douglas J. Centeno. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6965494) by Plaintiff ServisFirst Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Centeno, Douglas)
January 9, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 4 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Megan McCurdy. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (MRS)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff ServisFirst Bank. Publicly held company: ServisFirstBancshares, Inc,. (MRS)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff ServisFirst Bank Process Server: Morgan Legal Process Services (MRS)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT S against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-6963134, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by ServisFirst Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Form Notice of Process Server, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Form Corporate Disclosure)(McCurdy, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ServisFirst Bank v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young's WestSide Motors LLC
Represented By: J. Michael Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young's General Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: J. Michael Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis J Young
Represented By: J. Michael Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young's General Contractors LLC
Represented By: J. Michael Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ServisFirst Bank
Represented By: Megan Anne McCurdy
Represented By: Douglas J Centeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?