Cape Dogwood Redevelopment Corp. et al v. Global Bowling, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Michael Conejo and Cape Dogwood Redevelopment Corp.
Defendant: Global Bowling, LLC and Brent Dyer
Case Number: 1:2019cv00023
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Case Or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Global Bowling, LLC. (Wheeler, Jason)
February 21, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case Or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Defendants Michael Conejo, Brent Dyer. (Wheeler, Jason)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Interlocutory Order of Default (ECF No. 3) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/19/19. (THL)
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings. (CSG)
February 14, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Cape Dogwood Redevelopment Corp., Defendants Michael Conejo, Brent Dyer, Global Bowling, LLC to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 2/22/2019. (CSG)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Cape Dogwood Redevelopment Corp.. (Steffens, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Case Or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Plaintiff Cape Dogwood Redevelopment Corp.. (Steffens, John)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case Or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement filed by Plaintiff Cape Dogwood Redevelopment Corp.. (Steffens, John)
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Cape Dogwood Redevelopment Corp.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Steffens, John)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Case Or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement by Defendant Global Bowling, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Wurm, William)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case Or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement by Defendants Michael Conejo, Brent Dyer. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Wurm, William)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jason A. Wheeler for Defendants Michael Conejo, Brent Dyer, Global Bowling, LLC. (Wheeler, Jason)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
February 5, 2019 ***REMARK - Motion for Entry of Default Judgment has been forwarded to the Clerk of Court/Chief Deputy for ruling. (CSG)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni for all further proceedings. (CSG)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The undersigned U. S. District Judge recuses himself in this matter.The Clerk of the District Court is hereby directed to refer this case to another judge by random selection. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/5/19. (CSG)
February 5, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (CSG)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against defendant Global Bowling, LLC by Plaintiff Cape Dogwood Redevelopment Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(CSG)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Cape Girardeau County, filed by Cape Dogwood Redevelopment Corp.(CSG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2019: #1 Exhibit 1) (CSG).
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Cape Girardeau County, Missouri, case number 18CG-CC00277, with receipt number 0865-7018872, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand, filed by Brent Dyer and Michael Conejo with Exhibit A - documents from State Court, Exhibit B - Original Filing Form, Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet and Exhibit D - Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate.(Wurm, William) Modified on 2/5/2019 (CSG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cape Dogwood Redevelopment Corp. et al v. Global Bowling, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Conejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cape Dogwood Redevelopment Corp.
Represented By: John C. Steffens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Bowling, LLC
Represented By: Jason A. Wheeler
Represented By: William R. Wurm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Dyer
Represented By: William R. Wurm
Represented By: Jason A. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?