Gallagher v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Dennis Gallagher, II
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00087
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Dennis Gallagher, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Atty General 6/7/2019)(Overton, Kathleen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Dennis Gallagher, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Office of Regional Counsel 6/3/2019)(Overton, Kathleen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Dennis Gallagher, II. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ser ved US Atty 6/3/19)(Overton, Kathleen)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Plaintiff Dennis Gallagher, II. (CSG)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 6/20/2019. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 5/30/19. (CSG)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
May 29, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Attorney for Plaintiff, Kathleen Overton. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (CSG)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT with receipt number 0865-7239472, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Dennis Gallagher, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Atty General, #4 Summons Office of Regional Counsel, #5 Summons US Atty)(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallagher v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Gallagher, II
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?