Hughes v. Saul

Plaintiff: Teasha Hughes
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00094
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General filed by Teasha Hughes. (JAB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Office of Regional Counsel filed by Teasha Hughes. (JAB)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 6/18/2019 thru US Attorney, answer due 8/19/2019. (MRS)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
June 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to US Marshals Service. (KJS)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4 - Social Security Appeal IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (See order for full details). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/12/19. (KJS)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 6/12/19. (KJS)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S ORDER (GJL) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled case is transferred to the Southeastern Division and assigned to the Honorable Rodney W. Sippel, United States District Judge, under cause number 1:19-cv-00094 RWS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that cause number 4:19-cv-01683 UNA be administratively closed. (JWD)
June 12, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (JWD)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Teasha Hughes. (JWD)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Teasha Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Financial Affidavit)(Van Fossan, Kristen)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Teasha Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Original Filing Form original filing form, #3 Summons SSA Commissioner, #4 Summons US Attorney General, #5 Summons US Attorney)(Van Fossan, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teasha Hughes
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?