Midwest Surgical Center, LLC v. Overturf
Plaintiff: Midwest Surgical Center, LLC and Midwest Neurosurgeons, LLC
Defendant: David Overturf
Case Number: 1:2019cv00096
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Referring Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig for all further proceedings (CMH)
August 7, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiffs Midwest Neurosurgeons, LLC, Midwest Surgical Center, LLC, Defendant David Overturf to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (CSG)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Counsel Timothy Don Denny's Amended Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #10 on behalf of Defendant David Overturf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on July 10, 2019. (ACL)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Timothy Don Denny by Defendant David Overturf. (CSG)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis City filed by Defendant David Overturf. (Denny, Timothy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Timothy D. Denny. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7311881) by Defendant David Overturf. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing)(Denny, Timothy)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis City filed by Plaintiff Midwest Neurosurgeons, LLC. (Przulj, Nino)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis City by Plaintiff Midwest Neurosurgeons, LLC. (Przulj, Nino)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Midwest Neurosurgeons, LLC. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Przulj, Nino)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
June 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (CSG)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant David Overturf Sent To: Clerk of Court, unexecuted. (CSG) Modified on 6/13/2019 (CSG).
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of City of St. Louis, filed by Midwest Surgical Center, LLC.(CSG)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of St. Louis State of Missouri, case number 1922-CC00447, with receipt number AMOEDC-7277163, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by David Overturf.(Denny, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midwest Surgical Center, LLC v. Overturf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Surgical Center, LLC
Represented By: Nino Przulj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midwest Neurosurgeons, LLC
Represented By: Nino Przulj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Overturf
Represented By: Timothy D. Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?