Southern FS, Inc. v. Wyatt's One Stop, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Southern FS, Inc.
Defendant: Wyatt's One Stop, LLC, Rashena Wyatt and Martin Wyatt
Case Number: 1:2019cv00103
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 ***REMARK - Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default forwarded to MOEDml_ExecTeam. (CSG)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Southern FS, Inc. without prejudice as to Defendants Martin Wyatt and Rashena Wyatt only (Peters, Diedre)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Wyatt's One Stop, LLC by Plaintiff Southern FS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Supplement Proposed Order)(Peters, Diedre)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Defendant Wyatt's One Stop, LLC by Plaintiff Southern FS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Supplement Proposed Order)(Peters, Diedre)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall, no later than August 21, 2019, file appropriate motions for entry of default, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Court's consideration. Response to Court due by 8/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 08/07/2019. (CMH)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Southern FS, Inc.. Wyatt's One Stop, LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Peters, Diedre)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Southern FS, Inc.. Rashena Wyatt served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Peters, Diedre)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Southern FS, Inc.. Martin Wyatt served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Peters, Diedre)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Intent to Use Process Server: by Plaintiff Southern FS, Inc. (Peters, Diedre)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Southern FS, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Peters, Diedre)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
June 28, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Attorney for Plaintiff. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (CSG)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7303165, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Southern FS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit C-3, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Original Filing Form, #8 Summons Martin Wyatt, #9 Summons Rashena Wyatt, #10 Summons Wyatt's One Stop)(Peters, Diedre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern FS, Inc. v. Wyatt's One Stop, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyatt's One Stop, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashena Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern FS, Inc.
Represented By: Diedre Abigail Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?