Bollinger v. Saul
Plaintiff: Remi Bollinger
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00124
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service showing service on defendant by certified mail to U.S. Attorney General on 8/22/19. (CSG)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service showing service on defendant by certified mail to Office of Regional Counsel on 8/19/19. (CSG)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (CSG)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
August 5, 2019 Summonses Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summonses were hand delivered to U.S. Marshal Service, Cape Girardeau, Missouri. (CSG)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/5/19. (CSG)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 8/5/19. (CSG)
August 2, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. (CSG)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Remi Bollinger. (Overton, Kathleen)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Remi Bollinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Atty General, #4 Summons US Atty, #5 Summons Office of Regional Counsel)(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bollinger v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remi Bollinger
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?