King v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Tandy Ray King
Defendant: Maury Farmers Cooperative, Bayer Corporation, BASF Corporation and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00129
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Maury County Circuit Court filed by Defendant Maury Farmers Cooperative. (Gilmore, Marc)
August 29, 2019 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Ann E. Sternhell-Blackwell for Defendant Monsanto Company. (Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Maury County Circuit Court filed by Defendant Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Richard Braddock)(Sternhell-Blackwell, Ann)
August 22, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Maury County Circuit Court filed by Plaintiff Tandy Ray King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed and Returned Summons for Maury County Farmers Cooperative, #2 Exhibit Answer of Maury County Farmers Cooperative)(McKellar, Andrea)
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Maury County Circuit Court by Plaintiff Tandy Ray King. (McKellar, Andrea)
August 8, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MRS)
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 1:19-cv-00064. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.(DLB)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Pursuant to the Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-9) of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Docket No. 2820, this case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri for coordinated or consolidated proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and electronically transmit the record to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 8/7/19. (dt)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 9) rec'd from the Eastern District of Missouri. (Case is ready for closing/transfer; proposed order submitted to chambers). (af)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 9) filed by the UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL on MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, IN RE: DICAMBA HERBICIDES LITIGATION MDL No. 2820. Case is being transferred to the Eastern District of Missouri. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. (af)
August 1, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Marc Bradley Gilmore. (dt)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Bradley Gilmore on behalf of Maury Farmers Cooperative (Gilmore, Marc)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Before the Court is the motion of Defendants Monsanto Company, Bayer Corporation, and BASF Corporation for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint, filed July 30, 2019 (Docket Entry No. #12 ), which is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that all Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within fourteen (14) days of a ruling on whether or not this case will be transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. It is further ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for September 20, 2019, is CANCELLED. If this case remains pending in this District as of October 15, 2019, Defendants shall move for the initial case management conference to be reset. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 7/31/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by BASF Corporation, Bayer Corporation, Monsanto Company. (Polly, Erin)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/25/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Lela M. Hollabaugh on behalf of BASF Corporation (Hollabaugh, Lela)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 11:00 AM in Columbia before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt)
July 24, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Lela M. Hollabaugh, Erin Palmer Polly and Andrea T. McKellar. (dt)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BASF Corporation. (Hollabaugh, Lela)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Ty Witten. (dt) Modified on 7/24/2019 (dt).
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Monsanto Company. (dt)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bayer Corporation. (dt)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Palmer Polly on behalf of Bayer Corporation and Monsanto Company. (dt)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BASF Corporation, Bayer Corporation, Monsanto Company from Circuit Court for Maury County, Tennessee, case number 16538. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2958556) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Initial MDL Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - June 14, 2019 Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Service Papers, #4 Exhibit D - Circuit Court File, #5 Exhibit E - Claim File, #6 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tandy Ray King
Represented By: Andrea T. McKellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maury Farmers Cooperative
Represented By: Marc Bradley Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Erin Palmer Polly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Lela M. Hollabaugh
Represented By: John P. Mandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Erin Palmer Polly
Represented By: Ann E. Sternhell-Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?