Trexis Insurance Corporation v. Smelley et al
Plaintiff: Trexis Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Cooter R-IV School District, Tina Smelley, A. C., a minor, Dylan C Smelley, David Wayne Mathis, Jr, Michael Hatch, B.G., Focus Bank, T.K., B.P. and J.D.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00135
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Summonses Issued as to defendant A. C., a minor, B.G., B.P., Cooter R-IV School District, Focus Bank, Michael Hatch, J.D., David Wayne Mathis, Jr, Dylan C Smelley, Tina Smelley, T.K.. The summonses were emailed to Attorney for Plaintiff. (CSG)
October 9, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Trexis Insurance Corporation Process Server: Semo Process Service (Attachments: #1 Summons A. C., a minor, #2 Summons B. G., a minor, #3 Summons B. P., a minor, #4 Summons Cooter R-IV School District, #5 Summons David Mathis, Jr., #6 Summons Dylan Smelley, #7 Summons Focus Bank, #8 Summons J. D., a minor, #9 Summons Michael Hatch, #10 Summons T. K., a minor, #11 Summons Tina Smelley)(Harper, Christopher)
October 8, 2019 ***REMARK - Plaintiff's Attorney is directed file Notice of Process Server with completed summonses attached for service on new defendants added to case in the Amended Complaint filed this day. (CSG)
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant A. C., a minor, Cooter R-IV School District, David Wayne Mathis, Jr, Dylan C Smelley, Tina Smelley, Michael Hatch, B.G., J.D., B.P., T.K., Focus Bank Amendment to #1 Complaint, filed by Trexis Insurance Corporation. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Trexis Insurance Corporation.(CSG)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #18 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by Trexis Insurance Corporation, #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by David Wayne Mathis, Jr, Cooter R-IV School District. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Request for Leave to File Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment (Doc. 18) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 13) is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 10/8/19. (CSG)
October 4, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants Cooter R-IV School District, David Wayne Mathis, Jr, Plaintiff Trexis Insurance Corporation to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (CSG)
September 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Plaintiff Trexis Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment)(Harper, Christopher)
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Trexis Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy & Dec Page, #2 Exhibit Webber Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Focus Bank Demand)(Harper, Christopher)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by David Wayne Mathis, Jr.(Engelbart, Joshua)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cooter R-IV School District.(Engelbart, Joshua)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Cooter R-IV School District, David Wayne Mathis, Jr. (Engelbart, Joshua)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Cooter R-IV School District, David Wayne Mathis, Jr. (Engelbart, Joshua)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua J. Engelbart for Defendants Cooter R-IV School District, David Wayne Mathis, Jr. (Engelbart, Joshua)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Trexis Insurance Corporation. A. C., a minor served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Harper, Christopher)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Trexis Insurance Corporation. David Wayne Mathis, Jr served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Harper, Christopher)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Trexis Insurance Corporation. Cooter R-IV School District served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Harper, Christopher)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Trexis Insurance Corporation. Tina Smelley served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Harper, Christopher)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Trexis Insurance Corporation. Dylan C Smelley served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Harper, Christopher)
August 16, 2019 Summonses Issued as to defendant A. C., a minor, Cooter R-IV School District, David Wayne Mathis, Jr, Dylan C Smelley, Tina Smelley. The summonses were emailed to Attorney for Plaintiff. (CSG)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Trexis Insurance Corporation Process Server: Semo Process Service (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons for Dylan C. Smelley, #2 Summons Summons for Tina Smelley, #3 Summons Summons for David Wayne Mathis, JR., #4 Summons Summons for A.C., A Minor, #5 Summons Summons for Cooter R-Iv School District)(Harper, Christopher)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE re #1 Complaint, For Declaratory Judgment by Plaintiff Trexis Insurance Corporation. (Harper, Christopher) Modified on 8/16/2019 (CSG).
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, For Declaratory Judgment Original Filing Form by Plaintiff Trexis Insurance Corporation. (Harper, Christopher) Modified on 8/16/2019 (CSG).
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL Complaint for Declaratory Judgment Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Trexis Insurance Corporation. (Harper, Christopher) Modified on 8/16/2019 (CSG).
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 14, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. Plaintiff's attorney contacted with instructions to file Civil Cover Sheet, Original Filing Form, and service of process information. (CSG)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7395201, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Trexis Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Policy & Dec Page, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Cancellation Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Mailing Documents)(Harper, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trexis Insurance Corporation v. Smelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trexis Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Christopher M. Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooter R-IV School District
Represented By: Joshua J. Engelbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Smelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. C., a minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan C Smelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wayne Mathis, Jr
Represented By: Joshua J. Engelbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Focus Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.K.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?