Haynes v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jeannie L Haynes
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00146
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Jeannie L Haynes, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (CSG)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
August 26, 2019 Summonses Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summonses were hand delivered to U.S. Marshal - Cape Girardeau, MO. (CMH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/16/2019. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 08/26/19. (CMH)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 08/26/19. (CMH)
August 26, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (CMH)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeannie L Haynes. (Overton, Kathleen)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Jeannie L Haynes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Atty General, #4 Summons US Atty, #5 Summons Office Regional Counsel)(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie L Haynes
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?