Zlozower v. Zimmer Radio, Inc.
Plaintiff: Neil Zlozower
Defendant: Zimmer Radio, Inc. and Zimmer Radio of Mid-Missouri, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00162
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings. (CSG)
October 29, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendant Zimmer Radio of Mid-Missouri, Inc., Plaintiff Neil Zlozower to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/12/2019. (MRS)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to file Answer. Defendant's Answer is due no later than November 13, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 10/23/2019. (EMD)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni for all further proceedings. (MRS)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER..The undersigned U. S. District Judge recuses himself in this matter.The Clerk of the District Court is hereby directed to refer this case to anotherjudge by random selection.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/22/19. (MRS)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark Sableman for Defendant Zimmer Radio of Mid-Missouri, Inc.. (Sableman, Mark)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint, Through and Including November 12, 2019 by Defendant Zimmer Radio of Mid-Missouri, Inc.. (Nepple, Michael)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael L. Nepple for Defendant Zimmer Radio of Mid-Missouri, Inc.. (Nepple, Michael)
September 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Zimmer Radio of Mid-Missouri, Inc.. The summons was emailed to Plaintiff's Attorney. (MRS)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Zimmer Radio of Mid-Missouri, Inc.,Terminating Zimmer Radio, Inc. , filed by Neil Zlozower. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Original Photograph, #2 Exhibit B- Infringing Use, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (MRS)
September 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Plaintiff's Attorney. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MRS)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Neil Zlozower Process Server: Missouri Process Serving, LLC (Liebowitz, Richard)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Zimmer Radio, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7457998, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Neil Zlozower. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- The Photograph, #2 Exhibit B- Infringing Use of the Photograph, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zlozower v. Zimmer Radio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Zlozower
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Radio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Radio of Mid-Missouri, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Sableman
Represented By: Michael L. Nepple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?