Knop et al v. Saylers et al
Plaintiff: Sheri Baughman and Rick Knop
Defendant: Kyle Salyers and Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00186
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Perry County, Missouri filed by Plaintiffs Sheri Baughman, Rick Knop. (Kuhlman, Bradley)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Perry County, Missouri filed by Defendants Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc., Kyle Salyers. (Swift, Joseph)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Perry County, Missouri by Plaintiffs Sheri Baughman, Rick Knop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition for Wrongful Death, #2 Exhibit MSHP Crash Report, #3 Exhibit Illinois Secretary of State Corporation File Detail Report Old Dominion, #4 Exhibit Defendant Kyle Salyers Answer to Plaintiffs Petition, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Service Old Dominion, #6 Exhibit Entry of Appearance Old Dominion, #7 Exhibit Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line Inc.s Answer to Petition, #8 Exhibit Affidavit of Service Kyle Salyers, #9 Exhibit Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line Inc.s Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, #10 Exhibit Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line Inc.s Objections to Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production, #11 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #12 Exhibit Old Dominion website Service Centers in Illinois 11-21-19)(Kuhlman, Bradley)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig for all further proceedings. (CMH)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Swift, Joseph)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Kyle Salyers Sent To: State Court - Executed (Swift, Joseph)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to attorney Bradley D. Kuhlman from Clerk of the Court re: Pro Hac Vice (CMH)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 23, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (CMH)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by John R. McLeod for Defendant Kyle Salyers. (McLeod, John)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: 32nd Judicial Circuit - Perry County, filed by Rick Knop, Sheri Baughman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Original Filing Form)(CMH)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Kyle Salyers.(Swift, Joseph)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Kyle Salyers Sent To: Plaintiff (Swift, Joseph)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Perry County Missouri, case number 19PR-CC00047, with receipt number AMOEDC-7534954, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Kyle Salyers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Plaintiffs' Petition, #2 Exhibit B Fowler v. STL Trucking, #3 Exhibit C KM Estate of v. Keiper, #4 Exhibit D Sunderhuse v. Meiner, #5 Exhibit E = Clevenger v. Westfall- Odell Motors Inc., #6 Exhibit F Daniel Veehoff v. J.F., #7 Exhibit G Mays v. SE Cooperative Green, #8 Exhibit H Cert. State Court File, #9 Civil Cover Sheet I - State Court File, #10 Original Filing Form J - Original Filing Form)(Swift, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knop et al v. Saylers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Baughman
Represented By: John C. Steffens
Represented By: Bradley D. Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Knop
Represented By: John C. Steffens
Represented By: Bradley D. Kuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Salyers
Represented By: Joseph R. Swift
Represented By: John R. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Represented By: John R. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?