Brown v. Saul
Plaintiff: Donald Dewayne Brown
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00229
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 ***REMARK - Document #11 deleted as incorrectly filed. The next document shall carry doc #11. (CMH)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: Track 4 (Administrative). Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 01/30/2020. (CMH)
January 30, 2020 Filing 9 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Donald Dewayne Brown, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (CSG)
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Donald Dewayne Brown. U.S. Attorney's Office served on 12/26/2019, answer due 2/24/2020. (Collins, Thomas) Modified on 1/31/2020 (CSG).
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Donald Dewayne Brown. William Barr served on 12/30/2019, answer due 2/28/2020. (Collins, Thomas) Modified on 1/31/2020 (CSG).
January 30, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Donald Dewayne Brown. Andrew M. Saul served on 1/6/2020. (Collins, Thomas) Modified on 1/31/2020 (CSG).
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Donald Dewayne Brown. (Collins, Thomas)
December 23, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to tcollins@blantonlaw.com. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (CMH)
December 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was emailed to tcollins@blantonlaw.com. (CMH)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL - Original Filing Form re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Donald Dewayne Brown. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Collins, Thomas) Modified on 12/23/2019 (CMH).
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7653179, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Donald Dewayne Brown.(Collins, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2019: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (MRS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Dewayne Brown
Represented By: Thomas W. Collins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?