Roach et al v. Walters et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Roach, T.R., Michael Roach and G.R.
Defendant: Brayden Walters and Bradley Walters
Case Number: 1:2020cv00002
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: #15 MOTION to Continue filed by Bradley Walters, Brayden Walters GRANTED( Rule 16 Conference reset for 3/26/2020 11:00 AM in Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr..). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/25/20. (MRS)
February 24, 2020 Filing 15 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Defendants Bradley Walters, Brayden Walters.. (Raymond, Marcus) Modified on 2/25/2020 (MRS).
February 14, 2020 ***REMARK - Document #15 deleted as duplicate. Next document shall carry doc #`15 (MRS)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 16 ORDER: Joint Scheduling Plan due by 3/12/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 3/19/2020 10:30 AM by Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/13/20. (CSG)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Brayden Walters.(Raymond, Marcus)
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bradley Walters.(Raymond, Marcus)
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Marcus J. Raymond for Defendants Bradley Walters, Brayden Walters. (Raymond, Marcus)
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by T.R., Ashley Roach, G.R., Michael Roach. Brayden Walters served on 1/20/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (Rich, Thomas)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by T.R., Ashley Roach, G.R., Michael Roach. Bradley Walters served on 1/20/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (Rich, Thomas)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Appointment of Next Friend as to T.R. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/3/20. (MRS)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Appointment of Next Friend as to G.R. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/3/20. (MRS)
January 2, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Thomas C. Rich. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S ORDER (GJL) - Due to electronic case opening, the above numbered case was inadvertently opened in error. Therefore, this case will be administratively closed. The new case number in the Southeastern Division is 1:20cv2 SNLJ. (BAK)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT - Unredacted Complaint . (BAK)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to T.R. ; relationship to minor:Father by Plaintiff Michael Roach. (BAK)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Next Friend as to G.R. ; relationship to minor:Father by Plaintiff Michael Roach. (BAK)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs G.R., Ashley Roach, Michael Roach, T.R. Process Server: SEMO Process Service (BAK)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7663440, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Tymber Roach, Ashley Roach, Gage Roach, Michael Roach. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Process Server, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons Bradley Walters, #5 Summons Brayden Walters)(Rich, Thomas) Modified on 1/2/2020 (BAK). Modified on 1/6/2020 (CSG).
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7663440, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Tymber Roach, Ashley Roach, Gage Roach, Michael Roach. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Process Server, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons Bradley Walters, #5 Summons Brayden Walters)(Rich, Thomas) Modified on 1/2/2020 (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roach et al v. Walters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Roach
Represented By: Thomas C. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.R.
Represented By: Thomas C. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Roach
Represented By: Thomas C. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.R.
Represented By: Thomas C. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brayden Walters
Represented By: Marcus J. Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Walters
Represented By: Marcus J. Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?