American Federation of Government Employees v. U.S. Dept of Veteran Affairs
Plaintiff: American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, John J. Pershing Medical Center and Robert L Wilkie
Case Number: 1:2020cv00070
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Robert L Wilkie Amendment to #1 Complaint, 3 Summons(es) issued,, filed by American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(MRS)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, John J. Pershing Medical Center, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was emailed to Robert Smith. (Attachments: #1 Summons VA Medical)(MRS)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Summons: by Plaintiff American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338 (Smith, Robert)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Summons: by Plaintiff American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338 (Smith, Robert)
April 28, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338. Defendant All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Receipt of Service)(Smith, Robert)
April 9, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 1 @ 60 days Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Robert Smith. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MRS)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 1:20-cv-00070 against defendant U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, John J. Pershing Medical Center with receipt number AMOEDC-7858366, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit FLRA Decision, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons)(Smith, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Federation of Government Employees v. U.S. Dept of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Federation of Government Employees, Local 2338
Represented By: Robert Lee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, John J. Pershing Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?