Chapman v. Saul
Plaintiff: Celeste Christine Chapman
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2020cv00125
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Celeste Christine Chapman, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (CSG)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 7/6/2020. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 6/12/20. (CSG)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 6/12/20. (CSG)
June 12, 2020 Summonses Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summonses were mailed to U.S. Marshal Service, St. Louis, Missouri. (CSG)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
June 11, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. (CSG)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Celeste Christine Chapman. (CSG)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Andrew M. Saul Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Celeste Christine Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application to Proceed without payment of costs, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #4 Summons Summons to Attorney General, #5 Summons Summons to US Atty EDMO, #6 Summons Summons Andrew Saul)(Moroni, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Christine Chapman
Represented By: Michael A. Moroni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?