Larry Jones Farms Inc et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Case Number: 1:2020cv00130
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Cape Girardeau Office
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00153. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.(DLB)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-13) transferring this case to the U.S. District Court Eastern District of Missouri as part of MDL No. 2820 In Re: Dicamba Herbicides Litigation. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/16/2020. (jak)
June 5, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Deficiency Letter. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date as 6/4/2020 as marked on the document. (jak)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Complaint lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (thd) (Docket entry modified on 6/5/2020 to correct the file date) (jak)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Larry Jones Farms Inc, LAJ Farms Inc, and Charlie Farms Inc. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number JON000903. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2020: #2 Main Document - Correct (submitted 6/10/2020)) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larry Jones Farms Inc et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?