Myhre v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: John Myhre
Defendant: BASF SE, BASF Corporation and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00131
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-03019. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.(DLB)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-13) MDL No. 2820. This action is transferred to USDC Eastern District of Missouri and assigned to the Honorable Stephen N Limbaugh, Jr. Signed by John W Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, on 6/16/2020. (Case electronically transferred to Western District of Missouri) (des)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, BASF SE, and Monsanto Company. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac)
May 27, 2020 Judge Linda R Reade and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added (no conflicts identified). (pac)
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against BASF Corporation, BASF SE, Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3207542.), filed by John Myhre. Scheduling Report due by 8/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rouse, Ward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myhre v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Myhre
Represented By: Ward A Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?