Triple Eaton Farms, LLC v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Triple Eaton Farms, LLC
Defendant: BASF SE, BASF Corporation and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00133
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00101. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.(DLB)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the Eastern District of Missouri. (CS)
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Eastern District of Missouri. (CS)
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Triple Eaton Farms, LLC. BASF Corporation served on 5/29/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (Wilson, Benjamin)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Triple Eaton Farms, LLC. Monsanto Company served on 5/29/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (Wilson, Benjamin)
May 27, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3 : This docket entry was made in error. Attorney advises this is not a trademark/patent case. (LDR)
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 **ERROR, DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** NOTICE of mailing of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint. (CS) Modified on 5/27/2020 (LDR).
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BASF Corporation, BASF SE, Monsanto Company. (CS)
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BASF Corporation, BASF SE, Monsanto Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4282436), filed by Triple Eaton Farms, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triple Eaton Farms, LLC v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triple Eaton Farms, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin H. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?