Pomeroy et al v. McCadams et al
Plaintiff: Kayla Hollis, Siera Pomeroy and Blayne Pomeroy
Defendant: Joseph McCadams and Cape Girardeau Surgical Clinic, Inc. %
Case Number: 1:2020cv00157
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiffs Kayla Hollis, Blayne Pomeroy, Siera Pomeroy. . (Johnson, Mark)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 ORDER Joint Scheduling Plan due by 10/2/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/9/2020 10:30 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 08/24/20. (CMH)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Tricia J. Mueller for Defendant Cape Girardeau Surgical Clinic, Inc. %. (Mueller, Tricia)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Tricia J. Mueller for Defendant Joseph McCadams. (Mueller, Tricia)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Cape Girardeau Surgical Clinic, Inc. %, Joseph McCadams.(Smith, Michael)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J. Smith for Defendant Cape Girardeau Surgical Clinic, Inc. %. (Smith, Michael)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J. Smith for Defendant Joseph McCadams. (Smith, Michael)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Blayne Pomeroy, Siera Pomeroy, Kayla Hollis. Joseph McCadams served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (Johnson, Mark)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Blayne Pomeroy, Siera Pomeroy, Kayla Hollis. Cape Girardeau Surgical Clinic, Inc. % served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/20/2020. (Johnson, Mark)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Plaintiffs Kayla Hollis, Blayne Pomeroy, Siera Pomeroy. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 8/3/2020. (CMH)
July 22, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Mark S. Johnson at lindsay@johnsonschneider.com. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (CMH)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Kayla Hollis, Blayne Pomeroy, Siera Pomeroy Process Server: Cape Girardeau County Sheriff (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Summons Summons)(Johnson, Mark)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Medical Malpractice against defendant Cape Girardeau Surgical Clinic, Inc. %, Joseph McCadams with receipt number AMOEDC-8032766, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Blayne Pomeroy, Siera Pomeroy, Kayla Hollis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Letters of Office, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Affidavit Affidavit Pursuant to Section 538.225 RSMO, #4 Letter Opinion Letter of Dr. Carl Doerhoff, #5 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Johnson, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pomeroy et al v. McCadams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph McCadams
Represented By: Michael J. Smith
Represented By: Tricia J. Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cape Girardeau Surgical Clinic, Inc. %
Represented By: Michael J. Smith
Represented By: Tricia J. Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Hollis
Represented By: Mark S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siera Pomeroy
Represented By: Mark S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blayne Pomeroy
Represented By: Mark S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?