Smith v. S.S. Disability
Plaintiff: Elizabeth G. Smith
Defendant: S.S. Disability
Case Number: 1:2020cv00198
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant S.S. Disability, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was mailed to U.S. Marshal - St. Louis. (CMH)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 11/5/20. (CMH)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 11/5/20. (CMH)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant S.S. Disability Amendment to #1 Complaint (Social Security), filed by Elizabeth G. Smith. Related document: #1 Complaint (Social Security) filed by Elizabeth G. Smith.(CMH)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. w/ copy of Social Security Complaint for Self-Represented Litigants Fri Oct 23 10:07:43 CDT 2020 (Schaefer, Michelle)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall complete and file an amended complaint using the attached Social Security Complaint form no later than November 19, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail the Courts Social Security Complaint form for Self-Represented Litigants to Plaintiff Response to Court due by 11/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 10/23/20. (MRS)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
September 17, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Sep 17 11:00:37 CDT 2020 (admin,)
September 17, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (CSG)
September 17, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (CSG)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Elizabeth G. Smith. (CSG)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Jury Demand, filed by Elizabeth G. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(CSG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. S.S. Disability
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.S. Disability
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?