Wright v. Family Dollar Stores of Missouri, LLC
Plaintiff: Charlotte Wright
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Missouri, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00214
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 ORDER: Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/6/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/13/2020 10:30 AM by Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/14/20. (CSG)
October 13, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MFG)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S ORDER (GJL) - The above styled and numbered removal was opened on October 09, 2020 and assigned to the Eastern Division. After a review of the case, it was determined the case was assigned incorrectly. The case should have been assigned to the Southeastern Division. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled case is transferred to the Southeastern Division and assigned to the Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr, United States District Judge, under cause number 1:20-cv-00214-SNLJ. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that cause number 4:20-cv-01460-UNA be administratively closed. (MFG)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Mississippi County, filed by Charlotte Wright.(MFG)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Brian R. Betner for Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Missouri, LLC. (Betner, Brian)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Missouri, LLC. (Foppe, Patrick)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Missouri, LLC. (Foppe, Patrick)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Missouri, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Foppe, Patrick)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick E. Foppe for Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Missouri, LLC. (Foppe, Patrick)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Defendant Family Dollar Stores of Missouri, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, (Foppe, Patrick)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mississippi County Circuit Court, case number 20MI-CV00408, with receipt number AMOEDC-8205398, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Family Dollar Stores of Missouri, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Foppe, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Family Dollar Stores of Missouri, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Missouri, LLC
Represented By: Brian R. Betner
Represented By: Patrick E. Foppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Wright
Represented By: James M. McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?