Taylor v. Stange
Petitioner: Anthony S. Taylor
Respondent: Bill Stange
Case Number: 1:2020cv00242
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Mon Jan 4 12:39:29 CST 2021 (Schaefer, Michelle)
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL re #8 Order on Motion for Extension, #4 Order,,, by Petitioner Anthony S. Taylor. (a Copy of Order issued 12/28 mailed again to Taylor) (MRS)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Mon Dec 28 15:58:34 CST 2020 (Schaefer, Michelle)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion for Extension : time to file amended habeas corpus ;Extension date: 30 days from the date of this order. If Petitioner fails to comply with this Order, the Court may dismiss this action without further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/28/20. (MRS)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Amended Petition by Petitioner Anthony S. Taylor. (MRS)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Wed Dec 9 12:04:56 CST 2020 (Schaefer, Michelle)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER finding as moot #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/9/20. (MRS)
December 8, 2020 Receipt: $ 5.00, receipt number CAPE003963 WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. (LLS)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: filing fee ;Proposed extension date 2 weeks by Petitioner Anthony S. Taylor. (MRS)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. w/ copy of petiton for writ of habeaus corpus form and Motion to Proceed ifp as ordered Mon Nov 23 15:26:10 CST 2020 (Schaefer, Michelle)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to send petitioner both a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis form and a 2254 form.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than thirty (30) days from this Order, petitioner must either pay the $5 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner must fill out the 2254 form and return it to the Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. If petitioner fails to comply with this Order, the Court may dismiss this action without further proceedings.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs request for change of judge is DENIED. [ECF No. 3].IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs request for disclosure is DENIED as premature. [ECF No. 2]. Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 12/24/2020.. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/23/20. (MRS)
November 16, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Nov 16 15:02:30 CST 2020 (admin,)
November 16, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (MRS)
November 16, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. (MRS)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 Request for change of judge re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Anthony S. Taylor. (MRS)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 Request for disclosure #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Anthony S. Taylor. (MRS)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Anthony S. Taylor. Fee Due (Attachments: #1 Memo In Support, #2 Envelope)(MRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Stange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bill Stange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony S. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?