Davault v. Saul
Plaintiff: Donna M. Davault
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2020cv00247
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Donna M. Davault. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Atty General 12/14/20)(Overton, Kathleen) Modified on 1/15/2021 (CMH).
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Donna M. Davault. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served ORC 12/9/2020)(Overton, Kathleen)
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Donna M. Davault. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 12/10/2020, answer due 2/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served US Atty 12/10/20)(Overton, Kathleen)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Donna M. Davault, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. Consent to Magistrate Judge, Consent to Magistrate Judge (CMH)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 12/03/20. (CMH)
December 3, 2020 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was emailed to dap@danielparmelelaw.com. (CMH)
December 3, 2020 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to dap@danielparmelelaw.com. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (CMH)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT with receipt number AMOEDC-8291991, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Donna M. Davault. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Atty General, #4 Summons OGC, #5 Summons US Atty)(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davault v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M. Davault
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?