Bice v. Jordan
Plaintiff: Gary Dee Bice
Defendant: John Jordan
Case Number: 1:2020cv00263
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Order of Dismissal, #5 Memorandum & Order, by Plaintiff Gary Dee Bice. (CSG)
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk sent to pro-se prisoner re:FRAP - all procedures for filing Notice of Appeal (copy of motion to proceed IFP on appeal attached and mailed) (CSG)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5,6. Fri Dec 18 11:10:15 CST 2020 (Gould, Cathy)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: In accordance with the Memorandum and Order entered this date and incorporated herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice to the filing of a fully-paid complaint. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/18/20. (CSG)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) filed by Plaintiff Gary Dee Bice, #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Gary Dee Bice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Gary Bice's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice to the filing of a fully-paid complaint. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel (Doc. #4 ) is DENIED as moot. An appropriate Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/18/20. (CSG)
December 10, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Dec 10 13:01:20 CST 2020 (admin,)
December 10, 2020 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (CSG)
December 10, 2020 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. (CSG)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Gary Dee Bice. (CSG)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Gary Dee Bice. (CSG)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Gary Dee Bice. (CSG)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 DCM COMPLAINT against defendant John Jordan Jury Demand, filed by Gary Dee Bice. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Envelope)(CSG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bice v. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Dee Bice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?