Cane Creek Quarry, LLC v. Equipment Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cane Creek Quarry, LLC
Defendant: Equipment Transport, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Great West Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00268
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Butler County filed by Plaintiff Cane Creek Quarry, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Hanover Insurance Emails, #2 Exhibit 2 - Hanover Release Form)(Yarbro, Christopher)
January 20, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Butler County filed by Counter Claimants Equipment Transport, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Defendant Equipment Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Smith v AT&T, #3 Exhibit B-EWI Cleanup Invoice, #4 Exhibit C-2017 Property Assessment, #5 Exhibit D-10-28-20 Report)(Baron, Richard)
January 20, 2021 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard S. Baron for Counter Claimants Equipment Transport, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Defendant Equipment Transport, Inc.. (Baron, Richard)
January 6, 2021 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Cane Creek Quarry, LLC.. (Yarbro, Christopher)
January 6, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Cane Creek Quarry, LLC.(Yarbro, Christopher)
January 6, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Butler County filed by Plaintiff Cane Creek Quarry, LLC. (Yarbro, Christopher)
January 6, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Butler County by Plaintiff Cane Creek Quarry, LLC. (Yarbro, Christopher)
December 30, 2020 Filing 15 CJRA ORDER (GJL). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni to District Judge Stephen R. Clark. Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Clark for all further proceedings (CMH)
December 29, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Equipment Transport, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Perryman, Ted)
December 29, 2020 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Counter Claimant Great West Casualty Company. Parent companies: Old Republic Insurance Group, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Old Republic Insurance Group,. (Perryman, Ted)
December 18, 2020 Filing 12 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ)
December 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Equipment Transport, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Perryman, Ted)
December 18, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (CMH)
December 17, 2020 Filing 11 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, Butler County, Missouri, filed by Cane Creek Quarry, LLC.(CMH)
December 17, 2020 Filing 9 COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Cane Creek Quarry, LLC Jury Demand demand,, filed by Great West Casualty Company, Equipment Transport, Inc..(Perryman, Ted)
December 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Equipment Transport, Inc..(Perryman, Ted)
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Removal by Defendant Equipment Transport, Inc.. (Perryman, Ted)
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Equipment Transport, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Perryman, Ted)
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Counter Claimants Equipment Transport, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Defendant Equipment Transport, Inc.. (Perryman, Ted)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Shannon Camille King for Counter Claimants Equipment Transport, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Defendant Equipment Transport, Inc.. (King, Shannon)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Korissa M. Zickrick for Counter Claimants Equipment Transport, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Defendant Equipment Transport, Inc.. (Zickrick, Korissa)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Ted L. Perryman for Counter Claimants Equipment Transport, Inc., Great West Casualty Company, Defendant Equipment Transport, Inc.. (Perryman, Ted)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Butler County, case number 20BT-CV02402, with receipt number AMOEDC-8352602, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Equipment Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Counter-Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Perryman, Ted)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cane Creek Quarry, LLC v. Equipment Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cane Creek Quarry, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Yarbro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Great West Casualty Company
Represented By: Korissa M. Zickrick
Represented By: Ted L. Perryman
Represented By: Shannon Camille King
Represented By: Richard S. Baron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equipment Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Korissa M. Zickrick
Represented By: Ted L. Perryman
Represented By: Shannon Camille King
Represented By: Richard S. Baron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?