Levill v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kris Levill
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2021cv00001
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Kris Levill. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Kris Levill. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Kris Levill. Defendant Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/8/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. (Van Fossan, Kristen)
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4, Administrative. Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiff's complaint. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 1/7/21. (MRS)
January 6, 2021 Case Opening Notification: 3 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Attorney Van Fossan. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Matthew T. Schelp. (MRS)
January 5, 2021 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT with receipt number AMOEDC-8383200, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - No,, filed by Kris Levill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Commissioner of Social Security, #4 Summons US Attorney General, #5 Summons US Attorney)(Van Fossan, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levill v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris Levill
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?