Jones v. Saul
Plaintiff: Robert S. Jones
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2021cv00043
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 12 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Robert S. Jones, Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (CSG)
April 15, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Robert S. Jones re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (CSG)
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 4/8/2021 by serving Attorney General by certified mail (MRS)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service showing service on defendant by certified mail to Office of Regional Counsel on 4/5/21. (CSG)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 4/5/2021 through U.S. Attorney's Office, answer due 6/4/2021. (CSG)
March 30, 2021 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summonses were mailed to U.S. Marshal Service, St. Louis, Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons Office of Regional Counsel)(CSG)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 4/20/2021. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 3/30/21. (CSG)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 3/30/21. (CSG)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4-6. Tue Mar 30 14:47:20 CDT 2021 (Gould, Cathy)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Robert S. Jones. (CSG) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/30/2021) (CSG).
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand, filed by Robert S. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Envelope)(CSG) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/30/2021) (CSG).
March 26, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (CSG)
March 26, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (CSG)
March 26, 2021 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Mar 26 12:00:37 CDT 2021 (admin,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?