Sall v. United States of America
Petitioner: Mamadou A. Sall
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00140
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Respondent United States of America. (Sorrell, Keith) filed by United States of America ; ORDERED GRANTED ( Show Cause Response due by 12/15/2021.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/12/21. (MRS)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Respondent United States of America. (Sorrell, Keith)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4, Administrative Respondent shall show cause, in writing and within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order, why the relief requested in the instant petition for writ of coram nobis should not be granted.Show Cause Response due by 11/15/2021.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/28/21. (MRS)
September 23, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S ORDER (GJL) [COPY OF ORDER ENTERED IN 4:21-CV-01144 UNA]: The above styled and numbered case was opened on September 22, 2021 and assigned to the Eastern Division. After a review of the case, it was determined the case was assigned incorrectly. The case should have been assigned to the Southeastern Division. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled case is transferred to the Southeastern Division and assigned to the Honorable John A. Ross, United States District Judge, under cause number 1:21-cv-00140-JAR. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that cause number 4:21-cv-01144 UNA be administratively closed. (JWD)
September 23, 2021 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 MOTION for Writ of Error of Coram Nobis Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Petitioner Mamadou A. Sall. (Schriener, Kevin)
September 23, 2021 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (JWD)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Writ of Error of Coram Nobis by Petitioner Mamadou A. Sall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Schriener, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sall v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mamadou A. Sall
Represented By: Kevin L. Schriener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Harry Morley Swingle
Represented By: Keith D. Sorrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?