Deck v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Heather Dian Deck
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2022cv00008
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Social Security) by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Blank, Shane) filed by Kilolo Kijakazi ; ORDERED GRANTING ( Administrative Transcript Due 5/20/2022). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 03/18/2022. (CMH)
March 17, 2022 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Social Security) by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Blank, Shane)
January 25, 2022 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Shane Kyle Blank for Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Blank, Shane)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #3 Social Security Identification Form filed by Heather Dian Deck: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 3] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall electronically serve the complaint upon the Social Security Administration pursuant to this Court's Administrative Order In re: Service in Civil Actions Under the Social Security Act issued on September 10, 2021. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 01/20/22. (CMH)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4: Social Security Appeal. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/20/22. (CMH)
January 20, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Administrative Transcript Due 3/21/2022 (CMH)
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY IDENTIFICATION FORM as to Plaintiff Heather Dian Deck. (Young, Kelsey)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Heather Dian Deck. (Young, Kelsey)
January 19, 2022 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Heather Dian Deck. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Young, Kelsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deck v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Dian Deck
Represented By: Kelsey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Shane Kyle Blank
Represented By: USAO SSA Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?