Niekamp v. Story
Plaintiff: Scott Niekamp
Defendant: John D Story
Case Number: 1:2023cv00170
Filed: October 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2023 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Case Niekamp's Complaint for Declaratory Relief filed by Plaintiff Scott Niekamp. (Sposato, Rachel)
November 20, 2023 Filing 27 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiff Scott Niekamp. (Sposato, Rachel) filed by Scott Niekamp ; ORDERED GRANTING (Response/Reply to Court due by 12/11/2023.). Signed by Sr. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/20/2023. (CMH)
November 20, 2023 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,, filed by Defendant John D Story. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew R. Davis, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Davis, Matthew)
November 16, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiff Scott Niekamp. (Sposato, Rachel)
November 16, 2023 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (and permanent injunction) filed by Defendant John D Story. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of John D. Story, #2 Attachment Declaration of Matthew Davis, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Client General Account Agreement (2013), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Financial Snapshort Report (2013-2015) (Redacted), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Welcome Letter (2013) (Redacted), #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - AAA Arbitration Day (11.10.2021), #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - AAA Arbitration Day (11.11.2021), #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - AAA Arbitration Day 3 (11.12.2021), #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Niekamp Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Story Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Niekamp Motion to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration with Exhibits (05.31.2018), #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - NWM Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration (06.04.2018), #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Niekamp Reply in Support of Motion (09.26.2018), #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - NWM Reply in Support of Motion (09.26.2018), #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - Niekamp Motion for Injunction and Contempt with Exhibits (02.27.2019), #16 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Niekamp Reply in Support of Motion (04.17.2019, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - Niekamp Response to Surreply to Motion (05.07.2019), #18 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - Order Denying Niekamp Motion for Injunction and Contempt (06.28.2019), #19 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Niekamp Memorandum in Opposition to Story Memorandum Disputing the Existence of a Valid Agreement to Arbitrate (AAA), #20 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - Story Motion for Leave to File First Amended Petition (AAA), #21 Exhibit Exhibit 19 - Order Denying Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion for Leave to Amend (AAA), #22 Exhibit Exhibit 20 - Niekamp Motion to Exclude Expert Brooks Hamner from Testifying (AAA), #23 Exhibit Exhibit 21 - FINRA Letter of Acceptance, Waiver, and Consent (June 2021), #24 Exhibit Exhibit 22 - Consent Order (August 2021), #25 Exhibit Exhibit 23 - FINRA Brokercheck Report, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 24 - Niekamp's Answer to Story's Statement of Claim (06.23.2021) (FINRA), #27 Exhibit Exhibit 25 - Story Opposition to Niekamp Renewed Motion to Dismiss and for Sanctions (12.12.22) (FINRA), #28 Exhibit Exhibit 26 - Niekamp Letter to FINRA Requesting Stay (10.27.2023))(Davis, Matthew)
November 16, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Case Niekamp's Complaint for Declaratory Relief by Defendant John D Story. (Davis, Matthew)
November 9, 2023 Filing 22 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #21 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Defendant John D Story. (Davis, Matthew) filed by John D Story ; ORDERED GRANTED, for an additional 12 pages. Signed by Sr. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/9/2023. (JMC)
November 8, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Defendant John D Story. (Davis, Matthew)
November 1, 2023 Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (and permanent injunction) by Defendant John D Story. (Davis, Matthew) filed by John D Story ; ORDERED GRANTING John D Story answer due 11/16/2023.. Signed by Sr. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/01/2023. (CMH)
November 1, 2023 Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Connie Fickel. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10246243) by Plaintiff Scott Niekamp. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Anderson, Connie) filed by Scott Niekamp; ORDERED GRANTING. Signed by Sr. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/01/2023. (CMH)
October 31, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Connie Fickel. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10246243) by Plaintiff Scott Niekamp. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Anderson, Connie)
October 31, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (and permanent injunction) by Defendant John D Story. (Davis, Matthew)
October 30, 2023 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew Rhoades Davis for Defendant John D Story. (Davis, Matthew)
October 27, 2023 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by J. Michael Ponder for Defendant John D Story. (Ponder, J.)
October 26, 2023 Filing 14 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff Scott Niekamp re #13 Memorandum in Support of Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(Sposato, Rachel)
October 26, 2023 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (and permanent injunction) filed by Plaintiff Scott Niekamp. (Sposato, Rachel)
October 26, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (and permanent injunction) by Plaintiff Scott Niekamp. (Sposato, Rachel)
October 20, 2023 Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Plaintiff Scott Niekamp. (Sposato, Rachel) filed by Scott Niekamp ; ORDERED GRANTED, for an additional 12 pages. Signed by Sr. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/20/2023. (JMC)
October 20, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Errata: by Plaintiff Scott Niekamp re #9 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (Sposato, Rachel)
October 19, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Plaintiff Scott Niekamp. (Sposato, Rachel)
October 19, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Scott Niekamp. John D Story served on 10/16/2023, answer due 11/6/2023. (Edwards, Blake)
October 10, 2023 Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rachel M. Sposato. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10202469) by Plaintiff Scott Niekamp. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing for Rachel M. Sposato)(Sposato, Rachel) filed by Scott Niekamp ; ORDERED GRANTING. Signed by Sr. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/10/2023. (CMH)
October 6, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Rachel M. Sposato. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10202469) by Plaintiff Scott Niekamp. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Certificate of Good Standing for Rachel M. Sposato)(Sposato, Rachel)
October 4, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant John D Story. The summons was emailed to Blake Edwards. (JMC)
October 4, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Blake Edwards. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JMC)
October 3, 2023 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Blake Michael Edwards for Plaintiff Scott Niekamp. (Edwards, Blake)
October 3, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scott Niekamp. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Edwards, Blake)
October 3, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Scott Niekamp Process Server: HPS Process Service & Investigations (Edwards, Blake)
October 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant John D Story with receipt number AMOEDC-10194059, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Scott Niekamp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Petition for Damages and Accounting, #2 Exhibit 2 Statement of Claims, #3 Exhibit 3 Motion to Confirm Award, #4 Exhibit 4 Order and Judgment, #5 Exhibit 5 Pre Hearing Excerpts, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Original Filing Form)(Edwards, Blake)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niekamp v. Story
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Niekamp
Represented By: Blake Michael Edwards
Represented By: Connie Marie Anderson
Represented By: Rachel Sposato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D Story
Represented By: J. Michael Ponder
Represented By: Matthew Rhoades Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?