Pleus v. Hoeh-Pistorio et al
Plaintiff: Roger Allen Rios Pleus
Defendant: Caitlin M. Hoeh-Pistorio, Jason Klaus, Jason Kelly, C/O Amber Crites, Andy Pacinda, Matthew Misuraca, Derek Hunt, Christopher Bradford and Eli Isgriggs
Case Number: 1:2023cv00196
Filed: November 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Referring Judge: Matthew T Schelp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2023 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Roger Allen Rios Pleus. Andy Pacinda served on 12/21/2023, answer due 1/11/2024. (JMC)
December 18, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed Christopher Bradford served on 12/13/2023, answer due 1/3/2024. (MRS)
December 12, 2023 Filing 18 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Matthew T. Schelp for all further proceedings (JMC)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 18. Tue Dec 12 14:02:56 CST 2023 (Carter, Jessica)
December 7, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Roger Allen Rios Pleus. Eli Isgriggs served on 11/27/2023, answer due 12/18/2023. (CMH)
December 7, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Roger Allen Rios Pleus. Caitlin M. Hoeh-Pistorio served on 11/29/2023, answer due 12/20/2023. (CMH)
December 7, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Roger Allen Rios Pleus. Amber Crites served on 11/21/2023, answer due 12/12/2023. (CMH)
December 7, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Roger Allen Rios Pleus. Jason Kelly served on 11/21/2023, answer due 12/12/2023. (CMH)
December 7, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Roger Allen Rios Pleus. Derek Hunt served on 11/21/2023, answer due 12/12/2023. (CMH)
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Roger Allen Rios Pleus. Matthew Misuraca served on 11/22/2023, answer due 12/13/2023. (CMH)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Roger Allen Rios Pleus. Jason Klaus served on 11/22/2023, answer due 12/13/2023. (CMH)
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Party filed by Defendants Amber Crites, Caitlin M. Hoeh-Pistorio, Jason Kelly, Jason Klaus, Matthew Misuraca, Andy Pacinda. (Plunkert, Robert)
December 7, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Defendants Amber Crites, Caitlin M. Hoeh-Pistorio, Jason Kelly, Jason Klaus, Matthew Misuraca, Andy Pacinda. (Plunkert, Robert)
December 7, 2023 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert T. Plunkert for Defendants Amber Crites, Caitlin M. Hoeh-Pistorio, Jason Kelly, Jason Klaus, Matthew Misuraca, Andy Pacinda. (Plunkert, Robert)
December 5, 2023 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Party Hunt, Bradford & Isgriggs filed by Defendants Christopher Bradford, Derek Hunt, Eli Isgriggs. (Spradling, A.)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Party Hunt, Bradford & Isgriggs by Defendants Christopher Bradford, Derek Hunt, Eli Isgriggs. (Spradling, A.)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Pro Se Motion..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that "Plaintiff's Motion to the Court Requesting the Use of the United States Marshals Service (USMS) to Process Serve the Above-Mentioned Defendants" (Doc. 4) is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 11/9/23. (MRS)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Thu Nov 9 10:46:10 CST 2023 (Schaefer, Michelle)
November 3, 2023 Filing 4 PRO SE MOTION for Service by the U.S. Marshal Service by Plaintiff Roger Allen Rios Pleus. (JMC)
November 1, 2023 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
November 1, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to defendant Christopher Bradford, Amber Crites, Caitlin M. Hoeh-Pistorio, Derek Hunt, Eli Isgriggs, Jason Kelly, Jason Klaus, Matthew Misuraca, Andy Pacinda. The summons was hand delivered to Plaintiff. (MRS)
November 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Christopher Bradford, Amber Crites, Caitlin M. Hoeh-Pistorio, Derek Hunt, Eli Isgriggs, Jason Kelly, Jason Klaus, Matthew Misuraca, Andy Pacinda 9 Summons(es) issued, Jury Demand,, filed by Roger Allen Rios Pleus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MRS)
November 1, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. 9 Summons(es) issued and hand delivered to Plaintiff. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (MRS)
November 1, 2023 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (MRS)
November 1, 2023 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Nov 1 16:00:53 CDT 2023 (admin,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pleus v. Hoeh-Pistorio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Allen Rios Pleus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caitlin M. Hoeh-Pistorio
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Klaus
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Kelly
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Amber Crites
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Pacinda
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Misuraca
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Hunt
Represented By: A. M. Spradling, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Bradford
Represented By: A. M. Spradling, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Isgriggs
Represented By: A. M. Spradling, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?