White v. Hopkins et al
Plaintiff: Scotty Lee White
Defendant: Paul Hopkins, Ashley Lepold, Dane R. Roper, Angela Athmann, Chandra Miller and John Taylor
Case Number: 1:2023cv00208
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Referring Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Leave to File a Consent Motion for and Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendants Angela Athmann, Paul Hopkins, Ashley Lepold, Chandra Miller, Dane R. Roper, John Taylor. (Keller, Roger)
January 19, 2024 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Scotty Lee White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(MRS)
January 19, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Scotty Lee White. (MRS)
January 17, 2024 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Scotty Lee White. Angela Athmann served on 1/5/2024, answer due 1/26/2024. (MRS)
January 17, 2024 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Scotty Lee White. John Taylor served on 1/9/2024, answer due 1/30/2024. (MRS)
January 17, 2024 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Scotty Lee White. Ashley Lepold served on 1/5/2024, answer due 1/26/2024. (MRS)
January 17, 2024 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Scotty Lee White. Chandra Miller served on 1/5/2024, answer due 1/26/2024. (MRS)
January 17, 2024 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Scotty Lee White. Paul Hopkins served on 1/5/2024, answer due 1/26/2024. (MRS)
January 17, 2024 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Scotty Lee White. Dane R. Roper served on 1/13/2024, answer due 2/5/2024. (MRS)
January 12, 2024 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL re #14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Scotty Lee White. (CMH)
January 10, 2024 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Angela Athmann, Paul Hopkins, Ashley Lepold, Chandra Miller, Dane R. Roper, John Taylor Amendment to #1 Complaint, filed by Scotty Lee White. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Dane R. Roper, Paul Hopkins, Angela Athmann, Ashley Lepold, John Taylor, Chandra Miller.(JMC)
January 10, 2024 Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Scotty Lee White. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Amended Complaint)(JMC) filed by Scotty Lee White ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Sr. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/10/2024. (JMC)
January 8, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Scotty Lee White. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Complaint)(JMC)
January 4, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Scotty Lee White Process Server: Jason Morgan, Morgan Process Services (CMH)
January 4, 2024 Filing 12 Request for Electronic Noticing from Scotty Lee White. Email Address will be added to the party's record. (CMH)
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint: Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Scotty Lee White. (CMH)
January 4, 2024 Summons Issued as to defendant Angela Athmann, Paul Hopkins, Ashley Lepold, Chandra Miller, Dane R. Roper, John Taylor. The summons was emailed to scottyw4755@outlook.com. (CMH)
January 3, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #9 Supplemental filed by Plaintiff Scotty Lee White. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Notice of Intent to Use Process Server. (Note: Issuance of Summons will be delayed pending receipt of Notice.) (CMH)
January 3, 2024 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Scotty Lee White. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(CMH)
January 2, 2024 Filing 8 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni termed. Case reassigned to Sr. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr for all further proceedings (JMC)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Tue Jan 2 12:55:50 CST 2024 (Carter, Jessica)
December 28, 2023 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Scotty Lee White re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 1/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (CMH)
December 26, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Scotty Lee White. (CMH)
December 26, 2023 Filing 5 Receipt: $ 402.00, receipt number 5454 Filing Fee. (CMH)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall either pay the $402 filing fee, or file a fully-completed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to Plaintiff a copy of the Courts form Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Plaintiff's failure to timely comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this case, without prejudice and without further notice. Response to Court due by 12/28/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abbie Crites-Leoni on 12/14/2023. (CMH)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Along with a copy of the Courts Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Thu Dec 14 11:49:06 CST 2023 (Hency, Christy)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Scotty Lee White. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Plaintiff must file Original Filing Form, Proposed Summons, and Notice of Intent to Use Process Server. (CMH)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendant, Jury Demand, filed by Scotty Lee White. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(CMH) Modified on 11/29/2023 (CMH).
November 29, 2023 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (CMH)
November 29, 2023 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Nov 29 15:02:43 CST 2023 (admin,)
November 29, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (CMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Hopkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scotty Lee White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hopkins
Represented By: Roger A. Keller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Lepold
Represented By: Roger A. Keller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane R. Roper
Represented By: Roger A. Keller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Athmann
Represented By: Roger A. Keller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandra Miller
Represented By: Roger A. Keller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Taylor
Represented By: Roger A. Keller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?