Wetmore et al v. Brassfield et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Wetmore and Victory Strategies, LLC
Defendant: Adam Heath Brassfield, Veronica Brassfield, Adam Brassfield, Inc. and Brass21 Productions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00209
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Abbie Crites-Leoni
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Victory Strategies, LLC, Benjamin Wetmore. (Burns, Jonathon)
January 16, 2024 Filing 15 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendants Adam Brassfield, Inc., Brass21 Productions, LLC, Adam Heath Brassfield, Veronica Brassfield, Plaintiffs Victory Strategies, LLC, Benjamin Wetmore. Consent to Magistrate Judge, Consent to Magistrate Judge (CMH)
January 11, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendant Adam Brassfield, Inc.. (Clubb, John)
January 11, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Brass21 Productions, LLC.(Clubb, John)
January 11, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Veronica Brassfield.(Clubb, John) (Main Document 12 replaced on 1/17/2024) (JMC).
January 11, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Adam Heath Brassfield.(Clubb, John) (Main Document 11 replaced on 1/17/2024) (JMC).
January 11, 2024 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by John P. Clubb for Defendants Adam Brassfield, Inc., Brass21 Productions, LLC, Adam Heath Brassfield, Veronica Brassfield. (Clubb, John)
January 11, 2024 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants Adam Brassfield, Inc., Brass21 Productions, LLC, Adam Heath Brassfield, Veronica Brassfield, Plaintiffs Victory Strategies, LLC, Benjamin Wetmore to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 1/22/2024. (MRS)
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 CLERK'S ORDER (GJL) [COPY OF ORDER ENTERED IN 4:23-CV-01514 UNA] - The above styled and numbered case was opened in CM/ECF on November 28, 2023 and assigned to the Eastern Division. After a review of the case, it was determined the case was assigned incorrectly. The case should have been assigned to the Southeastern Division. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-styled case is transferred to the Southeastern Division and assigned to the Honorable Abbie Crites-Leoni, United States Magistrate Judge, under cause number 1:23CV00209 ACL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that cause number 4:23CV01514 UNA be administratively closed. (JWD)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Victory Strategies, LLC, Benjamin Wetmore Process Server: Ron Rugen, Action Legal Process (Attachments: #1 Summons Adam Brassfield, #2 Summons Veronica Brassfield, #3 Summons Adam Brassfield, Inc., #4 Summons Brass21 Productions LLC)(Burns, Jonathon)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 FINAL NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint, 2 Electronic Notice of Filing Deficiency,. The filing deficiency previously identified has not been corrected by the filing attorney as it relates to FRCP Rule 4 service documents (waiver or summonses). Case to proceed to judge assignment and further review by the Clerks Office Exec. Team. (JWD) Modified on 11/30/2023 (JWD). The filer corrected the final deficiency on 11/30/2023.
November 30, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (MRS)
November 30, 2023 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The summonses were emailed to attorney Jonathon Burns. (JWD)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Victory Strategies, LLC, Benjamin Wetmore.. (Burns, Jonathon)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, Original Filing Form by Plaintiffs Victory Strategies, LLC, Benjamin Wetmore. (Burns, Jonathon)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs Victory Strategies, LLC, Benjamin Wetmore. (Burns, Jonathon)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Original Filing Form not filed. Civil Cover Sheet not filed. Notice of Process Server form and Completed Summons or Request for Waiver of Service not filed. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JWD)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs with receipt number AMOEDC-10294800, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Benjamin Wetmore, Victory Strategies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defamatory Statement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Table of Defamatory Statements)(Burns, Jonathon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wetmore et al v. Brassfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Wetmore
Represented By: Jonathon Christian Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victory Strategies, LLC
Represented By: Jonathon Christian Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Heath Brassfield
Represented By: John P. Clubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Brassfield
Represented By: John P. Clubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Brassfield, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Clubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brass21 Productions, LLC
Represented By: John P. Clubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?