Walker v. Missouri Department of Corrections, Missouri Parole Board
Plaintiff: DeMun D. Walker
Defendant: Missouri Department of Corrections, Missouri Parole Board
Case Number: 1:2024cv00056
Filed: March 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2024 Filing 12 Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff DeMun D. Walker. (CMH)
May 8, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff DeMun D. Walker. (CMH)
April 29, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Plaintiff DeMun D. Walker. (MRS)
April 19, 2024 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to DeMun Walker. Returned document(s): #5 Memorandum & Order,,,. New address given to CM/ECF Administrator and clerk resent document to SECC. (MRS)
April 8, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff DeMun D. Walker. (CMH)
April 5, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Relief Prospective Relief by Plaintiff DeMun D. Walker. (CMH)
April 4, 2024 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Plaintiff a blank Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must either pay the $405 filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff files an application to proceed in forma pauperis, he must also file a certified copy of his prison account statement for the six-month period preceding the filing of the complaint.IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice Response to Court due by 4/26/2024.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 3/27/24. (MRS)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. w/copy of the Courts form Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Affidavit in Support Wed Mar 27 14:24:00 CDT 2024 (Schaefer, Michelle)
March 20, 2024 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:24-cv-00138. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
March 20, 2024 Case electronically transferred to District of Missouri Eastern. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
March 20, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (MRS)
March 20, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (MRS)
March 20, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Mar 20 13:00:48 CDT 2024 (admin,)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on 3/13/2024 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Willis, Kathy)
February 13, 2024 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by DeMun D Walker. (Willis, Kathy)
February 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by DeMun D Walker. (#1 1983 Attachments)(Willis, Kathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Missouri Department of Corrections, Missouri Parole Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeMun D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Department of Corrections, Missouri Parole Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?