Trotter v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Trotter
Defendant: Wendy Marie Miller, Whithney Conney, Howard Michael, Jeff Klott and Sue King
Case Number: 1:2024cv00069
Filed: April 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2024 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 2:23-cv-04240. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
April 3, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (CMH)
April 3, 2024 Case electronically transferred to District of Eastern Missouri. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy)
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on 3/19/2024 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. (Willis, Kathy)
March 11, 2024 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Daniel Trotter as directed by Order (Doc. #12 ) dated 2/27/2024.(Willis, Kathy)
March 11, 2024 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT filed by Daniel Trotter.(Related document #12 ) (Willis, Kathy)
March 8, 2024 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT filed by Daniel Trotter.(Willis, Kathy) (Related Doc. #12 )
March 7, 2024 Filing 13 PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT filed by Daniel Trotter.(Related document #12 ) (Willis, Kathy)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: (1) the Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff another set of civil rights forms for his use in filing an amended complaint; (2) Plaintiff is directed to file a single amended complaint, as specifically discussed above; and (3) Plaintiff's failure to amend the complaint as directed, on or before March 12, 2024, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 2/27/2024 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. (CLERK'S NOTE: A set of civil rights forms along with this order mailed to plaintiff as directed.) (Willis, Kathy)
February 26, 2024 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Howard Michael filed by Daniel Trotter.(Willis, Kathy)
February 26, 2024 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Whithney Conney filed by Daniel Trotter.(Willis, Kathy)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: (1) the Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff another set of civil rights forms for his use in filing an amended complaint; (2) Plaintiff is directed to file a single amended complaint, as specifically discussed above; and (3) Plaintiff's failure to amend the complaint as directed, on or before March 7, 2024, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice.IT IS SO ORDERED. (CLERK'S NOTE: Civil rights forms mailed to Plaintiff as directed.) Signed on 2/7/2024 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. (Willis, Kathy)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis; and (2) the agency having custody of Plaintiff will be required to forward to the Clerk of the Court periodic payments from Plaintiff's inmate account, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), until the balance of the $350.00 filing fee is paid.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 2/6/2024 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. (Willis, Kathy)
February 2, 2024 Filing 7 PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT filed by Daniel Trotter.(Willis, Kathy)
January 26, 2024 Filing 6 PLAINTIFF'S SECOND RESPONSE to Order (Doc. #4 ) filed by Daniel Trotter.(Willis, Kathy)
January 25, 2024 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE to Order (Doc. #4 ) filed by Daniel Trotter.(Willis, Kathy)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, an initial partial filing fee of $2.26; and (3) Plaintiff's failure to pay the required initial partial filing fee on or before FEBRUARY 2, 2024, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on 1/12/2024 by District Judge Brian C Wimes. (Willis, Kathy)
January 11, 2024 Filing 3 INMATE ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Daniel Trotter. (Willis, Kathy)
December 26, 2023 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Daniel Trotter. (Willis, Kathy)
December 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Daniel Trotter. (#1 1983 attachments)(Willis, Kathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trotter v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Trotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Marie Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whithney Conney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Klott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?