Smith v. Sumner et al
Plaintiff: |
Jessica Smith |
Defendant: |
Missouri Department of Corrections and Jim Sumner |
Case Number: |
2:2011cv00039 |
Filed: |
May 25, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Hannibal Office |
County: |
Livingston |
Presiding Judge: |
Mary Ann L. Medler |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 20, 2012 |
Filing
68
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 65 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Plaintiff Jessica Smith motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/20/12. (LGK)
|
November 9, 2012 |
Filing
59
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to compel [#58] is granted in part and denied in part as follows: defendant is required to provide complete responses without any objection, in writing and under oath, to all of plaintiff's discovery requests except for Interrogatory Number 3 by Wednesday, November 14, 2012. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the imposition of sanctions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff is granted an extension of time , up to and including December 14, 2012 to file his opposition to summary judgment. Defendant may file any reply brief in support of summary judgment by December 24, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall supplement his summary judgment mot ion with complete copies of all deposition testimony by November 13, 2012 or the motion will be denied. Defendant shall also deliver a courtesy copy of his summary judgment motion, memorandum in support with all exhibits, and complete copies of all d eposition testimony to the chambers of the undersigned by the same date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Mary Delworth is representing defendant in this case, then she shall file an entry of appearance by November 13, 2012, and submit an affidavit by that same date stating that she has shown this Memorandum and Order to her supervising attorney at the Missouri Attorney General's Office. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 11/9/12. (LAH)
|
October 10, 2012 |
Filing
46
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to dismiss [#34] is denied. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 1010/12. (LAH)
|
September 15, 2011 |
Filing
25
MEMORANDUM OPINION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss filed by the DOC is GRANTED; Doc.8 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Jessica Smith's Complaint filed by Defendant Sumner is GRANTED; Doc. 14. IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that the only remaining claim in this matter is whether Defendant Sumner violated Plaintiff's constitutional rights in his individual capacity, as alleged in Count I of the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Ann L. Medler on 9/15/11. (LAH)
|
May 26, 2011 |
Filing
2
ORDER The case 4:11-cv-00956-MLM was filed in the Eastern Division of this court on May 25, 2011 and assigned to the Honorable Mary Ann L. Medler. Because the jurisdiction of this matter lies in the Northern Division of this district, this case shoul d have been assigned a Northern Division case number. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the cause 4:11-cv-00956-MLM is transferred to the Northern Division of this court and assigned Case No.2:11cv00039 MLM. The Honorable Mary Ann L. Medler will preside. Case No. 4:11cv000956 MLM is hereby administratively closed. Dated this 26th day of May, 2011. Signed by James G. Woodward, Clerk of Court.(SAJ) (SAJ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?