Perkins v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: |
Tracy D Perkins |
Defendant: |
John Wilson, Larry Crawford, George Lombardi and Patricia Cornell |
Case Number: |
2:2011cv00072 |
Filed: |
September 30, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Hannibal Office |
County: |
Audrain |
Presiding Judge: |
David D. Noce |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 7, 2014 |
Filing
141
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion in Limine [ECF No. 93 ] is GRANTED, in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion in Limine [ECF No. 138 ] is GRANTED, in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Designations [ECF No. 137 ] is HELD IN ABEYANCE, in part. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 11/07/2014. (CBL)
|
June 10, 2014 |
Filing
102
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant John Wilson's Motion to Stay Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion in Limine [ECF No. 98 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Tracy Perkins's Motion in Limine [ECF No. 93 ] is STAYED until disposition of the parties' respective motions for summary judgment. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 06/10/2014. (CBL)
|
February 7, 2014 |
Filing
69
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Tracy Perkins's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Expert Report [ECF No. 67 ] is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on February 7, 2014. (BRP)
|
October 6, 2011 |
Filing
3
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 USC 19973(g)(2), defendants shall reply to plaintiff's claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 10/6/11. (KXS)
|
October 3, 2011 |
Filing
2
ORDER: The above-styled case was filed in the Eastern Division of this court, in error, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the ORIGINAL above styled cause is transferred to theNorthern Division of this court and has been assigned Case No. 2:11cv00072 DDN.Case No. 4:11cv01713 AGF is hereby administratively closed. Please refer to Case No. 2:11cv00072 DDN in all future matters concerning this case.(DLT)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?