Scott v. Moore et al
Plaintiff: Adam James Scott
Defendant: David Moore, Robert Dawson, Michael Shively, Alan R Wyatt, Drew Belt, Jon Dwiggins, Nathaniel Eugene Flennory, Adair County Commission, Gary D. Jones and Robert T. Hardwick
Case Number: 2:2012cv00031
Filed: April 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Macon
Presiding Judge: Nannette A. Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, [Doc. No. 126 ], is GRANTED. A separate judgment in accordance with this Opinion, Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/20/17. (KJS)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, [Doc. No.'s 58 and 61 ], are granted. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 06/04/2014. (CLK)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Hardwick, Dawson, Moore, Shively, Clark and Miller's Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, [Doc. No.s 44 , 46 , 49 , and 50 ], are granted.IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that Plaintiff will be given 14 days from thedate of this Opinion, Memorandum and Order to file an Amended Complaint inaccordance with the discussion herein. Failure to file an Amended Complaint will result in dismissal of this action with prejudice.( Response to Court due by 2/10/2014.). Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 01/27/2014. (CLK)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 18 , 20 ORDERED that Defendants Dawson, Moore, Shivery, Wyatt, Belt and Dwiggins' Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiffs Amended Complaint, [Doc. No. 18], is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Adai r County Commission, Gary D. Jones and Robert T. Hardwick's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, [Doc. No. 20], is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff will be given 14 days from the date of this Opinion, Memorandum and Order to file an Amended Complaint in accordance with the discussion herein. Failure to file an Amended Complaint will result in dismissal of this action with prejudice. ( Response to Court due by 1/17/2013.). Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 1/3/13. (CEL)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, The above case was filed in the Eastern Division of this court, in error, on 04/11/2012and assigned to the Honorable Judge E. Richard Webber. Because the jurisdiction of this matter lies in the Northern Division of this district, this case sho uld have been assigned a Northern Division cause number. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Case No. 4:12cv00653 ERW is hereby administratively closed, and transferred to the NorthernDivision of this court. The case is now assigned Case No. 2:12cv00031 NAB. Magistrate Nannette A. Baker will preside in all future matters concerning this case. (DLT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan R Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Belt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Dwiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Eugene Flennory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adair County Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T. Hardwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam James Scott
Represented By: Stephen S. Wyse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?