August 9, 2018 |
Filing
166
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY FEES: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions of plaintiffs for attorney fees and expenses (Docs. 144 , 162 ) are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court finding that the following hourly ra tes and hours of effort are reasonable compensation for plaintiffs legal representation, rounded to the nearest hour, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants must pay plaintiffs CNS and HCC the following amounts as reasonable attorney fees: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 8/9/18. (JAB)
|
March 28, 2018 |
Filing
160
MEMORANDUM: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of plaintiffs for permanent injunctive and declaratory relief (Doc. 138 ) is GRANTED. An appropriate Judgment Order is filed herewith. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 3/28/18. (JAB)
|
October 9, 2015 |
Filing
124
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of the for- profit plaintiffs for entry of final judgment (Doc. 119) is sustained. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court enter final judgment in favor of plaintiffs Sharpe Ho ldings, Inc., Charles N. Sharpe, CNS Corporation, Ozark National Life Insurance Company, and N.I.S. Financial Services, Inc. against defendants. re: 119 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by Plaintiff Sharpe Holdings, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 10/9/15. (KKS)
|
June 17, 2015 |
Filing
118
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of plaintiffs for attorneys' fees and expenses (Doc. 110 ) is sustained in part and denied in part. Defendants shall pay plaintiffs $138,282.50 as reasonable attorneys' fees and $350.00 in expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 6/17/15. (JAB)
|
December 30, 2013 |
Filing
84
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of plaintiffs CNS International Ministries, Inc. and Heartland Christian College for leave to file an overlength memorandum in support of their pending motion (Doc. 63) is sustained. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of plaintiffs CNS International Ministries, Inc. and Heartland Christian College a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Doc. 64) is sustained. The preliminary injunction and stay currently in effect (Docs. 56 , 57 ) are extended to plaintiffs CNS International Ministries, Inc. and Heartland Christian College. re: 63 62 . Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 12/30/13. (KKS)
|
June 28, 2013 |
Filing
56
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants, their agents, officers and employees are prohibited from applying and enforcing against these plaintiffs, their employee health plan(s), or their insurer(s) the statute and regulations that require plaintiffs to provide employees insurance coverage for "[a]ll Food and Drug Administration approved contraceptive methods, sterilization procedures, and patient education and counseling for all women with reproductive capacity," as prescribed by a health care provider, 77 Fed. Reg. 8725, as well as any penalties, fines, assessments, or enforcement actions for noncompliance, including those found in 26 U.S.C. §§ 4980D and 4980H, and 29 U.S.C. § 1132, to the exten t these regulations require coverage of services that plaintiffs believe to be abortifacients. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of defendants for a second extension of time to file a response to plaintiffs' original and amended complaints ( Doc. 42 ) is sustained. Defendants may have until 28 days, from the date the court issues its ruling on the pending motion of defendants to stay these proceedings, to file a response to the plaintiffs' complaints. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of plaintiffs for a ruling (Doc. 55 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 06/28/2013. (DJO)
|
December 31, 2012 |
Filing
20
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of plaintiffs Sharpe Holdings, Inc., Charles N. Sharpe, Judi Diane Schaefer, and Rita Joanne Wilson for a temporary restraining order is sustained. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants are T EMPORARILY RESTRAINED from enforcing the ACA Mandate regulations regarding abortifacient devices and related counseling. See 42 U.S.C. § 300gg-13(a)(4), 26 U.S.C. § 4980D, § 4980H, and 29 U.S.C. § 1132. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of plaintiffs for a preliminary injunction is set for further hearing on January 14, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 12/31/12. (KXS)
|