December 6, 2016 |
Filing
82
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Defendant Hurley, Chenoweth, Wombles, Speagle, Wood, and Crum's Motion for Summary Judgement [ECF No. 70 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims against Defendant James Hurley, Terri Chenoweth, Daniel Wombles, Roxane Speagle, Timothy Wood, and Ronald Crum are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 12/6/16. (EAB)
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing
54
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Ronald Crum's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 49 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Daniel Human's claims against Defendant Ronald Crum are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 10/21/2015. (CBL)
|
September 2, 2015 |
Filing
51
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants James Hurley, Terri Chenoweth, Daniel Wombles, Susan Kattleman, Timothy Truelove, Stephen Burgett, Roxane Speagle, and Timothy Wood's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 36 ] is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Daniel Human's claims against Defendant Timothy Truelove are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 9/2/2015. (CBL)
|
October 9, 2014 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffss motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc.#2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $23.80 within thirty (30) days of the date of thi s Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for a n original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk s hall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants J. Hurley, T. Chenoweth, D. Womples, S. Kattelman, T. Truelove, S. Burgett, R. Speagle, and T. Wood in their individual capacities. As these individuals are employees of the Missouri Department of Corrections, they can be served according to the Courts waiver agreement with the Missouri Attorney General's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. Section 1997e(g)(2), defendants J. Hurley, T. Chenoweth, D. Womples, S. Kattelman, T. Truelove, S. Burgett, R. Speagle, and T. Wood shall reply to plaintiff's claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants in their official capacities because plaintiffss claimsagainst defendants in their official capacities fail to state a claim upon which re lief can be granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard. An Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order.( Response to Court due by 11/9/2014.) Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on October 9, 2014. (MCB)
|