Turner v. Lombardi et al
Plaintiff: |
Terry M. Turner |
Defendant: |
Kendis F. Archer, Thomas Pryor, Tomas V. Cabrera, Milom Farnhan, Jessica L. Ballinger and Gladys E. Dixon |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00048 |
Filed: |
July 14, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
Hannibal Office |
County: |
Pike |
Presiding Judge: |
E. Richard Webber |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 23, 2016 |
Filing
79
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Pro Se Motion for Summary Judgment and His Suggestions in Support [ECF No. 57 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 62 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendants are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 9/23/16. (EAB)
|
April 8, 2016 |
Filing
55
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's pro se motion for injunctive relief [ECF No. 43 ] is DENIED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs renewed motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. 38 ] is DENIED wi thout prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs request to prevent Defendant Thomas Pryor from speaking with him regarding the subject of his case [ECF No. 44 ] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 4/8/16. (EAB)
|
December 4, 2015 |
Filing
34
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motions for appointment of counsel [ECF Nos. 4 , 15 ] are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 12/04/15. (EAB)
|
November 16, 2015 |
Filing
32
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss [ECF No. 19 ] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's due process claims are DISMISSED. In all other respects, the motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 11/16/2015. (CBL)
|
September 16, 2015 |
Filing
21
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to docket plaintiff's notice of serious medical need [ECF No. 18] as a motion for injunctive relief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for injunctive relief is DENIED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on September 16, 2015. (MCB)
|
July 17, 2015 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $10.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) tha t the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process on defendants Kendis Archer, Thomas Pryor, Tomas Cabrera, Milom Farnhan, Jessica Ballinger, and Gladys Dixon. The Clerk must serve these defendants in accordance with the Court's agreement with Corizo n, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendants George Lombardi, James Hurley, or Phillip Dean because, as to these defendants, the complaint is legally frivolous or fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, or both. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard. An Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 07/17/2015. (CBL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?