Lesley v. Teague et al
Plaintiff: Richard W. Lesley
Defendant: Jane Doe Teague, Jane Doe Powelson, John Doe Thompson, M.C.C. Corizon Nurse Supervisor, Dean Minor and Alan Earls
Case Number: 2:2015cv00059
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: Hannibal Office
County: Pike
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motions to Amend-Alter Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed to Motion to Alter or Amend Summary Judgment [Doc. No.'s 161 and 164 ], are DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/15/17. (KKS)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment [Doc. No.s 86 , 105 and 109 ] are granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Deny All Summary Judgment motions, [Doc. No. 154 ] is denied. A separate Judgment in accordance with this Opinion, Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/10/17. (KJS)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motions for Appointment of Counsel [Doc. No. 69, 74 and 116], are denied without prejudice. 69 116 74 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/19/16. (CLA)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to update the docket sheet [ECF No. 41 ] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk is directed to terminate Jane Does 2-7 and to add defendants Stacy Mosley, Kala Hunt er, Mary Mills, and Jeremy Trustee to the docket sheet.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Stacy Mosley, Kala Hunter, Mary Mills, and Jeremy Trustee are DISMISSED without prejudice.An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately., Stacy Mosley, Kala Hunter, Mary Mills and Jeremy Trustee added. Jane Does 2-7 terminated.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 01/20/2016. (CLK)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motions to compel [ECF No. 35] and for extension of time [ECF No. 36] are DENIED. 35 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/7/16. (CLA)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to file an amended complaint [ECF No. 28] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendant Jeffery Ostemann. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Dean Minor, Alan Earls, and John Does 1-10 are DISMISSED without prejudice.An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. 28 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/5/16. (CLA)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [[ECF No. 29 ] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 01/04/2016. (CLK)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint [ECF No. 20 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to reinstate or add Jane Does 1-7 as defendants in this action.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/30/15. (KJS)
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to amend the complaint and for discovery [ECF No. 9 ] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/23/15. (KJS)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendant unknown Thompson, Correctional Officer, III, Moberly Correctional Center. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the remaining defendants are DISMISSED from the complaint. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/2/15. (KJS)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No.[ 2]] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $45.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an origina l proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a prisoner civil rights complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without further proceedings. ( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 10/10/2015., Response to Court due by 9/25/2015.) Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 8/26/15. (JAB) (Remark: Prisoner Civil rights complaint form and copy of this order mailed to plaintiff)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lesley v. Teague et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard W. Lesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Powelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.C.C. Corizon Nurse Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Minor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Earls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?